judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00058-CR
09-81-00058-CR
10/12/1981
Extradition
Goddard, James A.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/22/1982Mandate Issued
03/31/1982Petition for ReviewRefused
01/19/1982Petition for Review
01/07/1982Motion for Rehearing FiledOverruled
12/09/1981Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
11/03/1981Brief Filed
10/29/1981Brief Filed
10/15/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/12/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/22/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
128th District Court
Orange
Honorable Patrick Clark
A-10432
10 Years