judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-00240-CR
13-81-00240-CR
10/14/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Buitureida, Jose & Enrique, Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/19/1986Record checked in
01/02/1986Record checked out
12/27/1985Letter sent
10/28/1985Mandate Issued
10/23/1985Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/25/1985Higher Court Decision
01/24/1985Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
01/24/1985Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
01/24/1985Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
01/17/1985XPetition for Discretionary Review
01/17/1985Petition for Review
01/14/1985Petition for Review
01/08/1985Petition for Review
12/17/1984ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
11/29/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/08/1984Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/29/1984Miscellaneous Motion
10/24/1984Supplemental Citations
09/07/1984Supplemental Citations
10/04/1983Response to _____________.
09/16/1983Post Submission Brief Filed
09/08/1983Submitted
09/06/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
09/02/1983Exhibits Filed
09/01/1983Miscellaneous Motion
09/01/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/19/1983Motion to Reset submission
08/15/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
07/29/1983Submission
06/03/1983Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/19/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable Darrell Hester
81-CR-128-D
50 years each