judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01039-CR
05-81-01039-CR
10/13/1981
Rape
Bearden, Larry Weston
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1984Mandate Issued
10/19/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/14/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/23/1983Submitted
09/02/1983MattConv
08/26/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/11/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/11/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/22/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/13/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/13/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/14/1983Submitted
02/11/1983Submission
12/20/1982Brief Filed
10/19/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/16/1982Brief Filed
08/09/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/16/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
10/13/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/1984Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
F81-7680-RPK
Life, tdc