judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00796-CR
14-81-00796-CR
10/14/1981
Other Felony
Gearing, Floyd Ray
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/1985Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/10/1984Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
10/03/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
09/19/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
08/18/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
08/18/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
07/28/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
07/14/1983Submission
07/14/1983Submission
07/14/1983Submitted
05/02/1983Case ready to be set
04/25/1983No description available.
04/08/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
04/08/1983Case ready to be set
03/09/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
12/16/1982Order Entered
02/18/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
10/14/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
10/14/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/13/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJ. Sidney Crowley
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantNeal Y. Pickett
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
340,303
life