judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00062-CR
09-81-00062-CR
10/14/1981
Other Felony
Brandley, Clarence L.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/10/1982Mandate Issued
06/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/03/1982Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/1981Brief Filed
10/29/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/14/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
01/07/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/10/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
221st District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Monte D. Lawlis
13876
3 Years