judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00163-CV
08-81-00163-CV
10/13/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Kirk, Jack Clayton, et al.,
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/05/1984Shuck purged
02/24/1984Permanent Withdrawal of Exhibits
08/29/1983Permanent Withdrawal of Exhibits
07/28/1983Mandate Issued
06/20/1983No description available.
06/02/1983No description available.
05/25/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/24/1983Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
05/12/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/12/1983No description available.
04/27/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/1983No description available.
04/14/1983No description available.
03/30/1983No description available.
03/30/1983No description available.
03/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/16/1982Submitted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
C 57-827