judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00075-CR
01-82-00075-CR
10/14/1981
Other Felony
Davis, Gaylord Wayne 336262
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/17/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/05/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
03/16/1983No description available.Refused
12/23/1982Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
12/23/1982Motion for rehearing filed
09/20/1982Motion to extend time to file motion for rehearing
09/09/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/09/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/08/1982Submission
09/08/1982Submitted
07/02/1982Motion for leave to file
04/06/1982Brief filed
04/06/1982Case ready to be set
02/03/1982Record filed
10/14/1981Notice of appeal filed
10/14/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information