judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-81-00020-CV
02-81-00020-CV
10/14/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Evans, Lon, Sheriff of Tarrant County, Texas
Pringle, Brantley and Barry G. Johnson
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/12/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/24/1982Writ DisposedReversed and Rendered
07/26/1982Writ Filed
06/24/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clyde E. Whiteside
48-65391-81