judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00164-CR
08-81-00164-CR
10/14/1981
Theft
Maldonado, Domicindo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
12/20/1982Mandate Issued
10/06/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/02/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
12/22/1981No description available.
12/18/1981Brief Filed
12/18/1981Brief Filed
12/18/1981Statement of Facts Filed
12/18/1981Transcript Filed
11/04/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/14/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam W. Callan
34483-205
2-8 Yrs.