judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-00255-CR
13-81-00255-CR
10/14/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Perez, Juan Celestino
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/23/1984Mandate Issued
06/21/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/14/1984Exhibits Filed
01/19/1984Submitted
12/19/1983Submission
03/12/1982Case ready to be set
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/23/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable Ronald Yeager
80-CR-271-D
50 years TDC