judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-00254-CR
13-81-00254-CR
10/14/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mejia, Juan Martinez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1987Green card in
10/12/1987Record checked in
10/08/1987Order Entered
10/08/1987Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1987Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/06/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
138th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Harry D Lewis
80-CR-341-B
50 years TDC