judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00095-CR
10-81-00095-CR
10/01/1981
Aggravated Robbery
Alton Stevenson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/1982Case stored
02/01/1982Mandate issued by this Court
11/30/1981Judgment Issued
11/30/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/19/1981Submitted
10/01/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/01/1981Clerks record filed
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
09/01/1981Docketing statement filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/01/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
295515
25 Years