judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00096-CR
10-81-00096-CR
10/01/1981
Burglary of a Habitation
Billy Joe Gray
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1983Case stored
04/04/1983Mandate issued by this Court
10/28/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/07/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/04/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
313241
99 Years + $10,000 Fine