judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00090-CR
10-81-00090-CR
10/01/1981
Murder
Charles McKeever
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/1982Case stored
10/25/1982Mandate issued by this Court
07/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
277495
Life