judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAMMY ARMSTRONG, as the Personal Representative of SJR, deceased, and as Administratrix of the Estate of SJR, deceased, and on behalf of TAMMY ARMSTRONG, individually, and as Guardian, Conservator, and Guardian-Ad-Litem for SRA, a minor, and SAA, a minor v. YOUTH ALTERNATIVE HOME ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (S-09-0036)
Case Number:S-09-0036Case Docketed On:02/26/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:TAMMY ARMSTRONG, as the Personal Representative of SJR, deceased, and as Administratrix of the Estate of SJR, deceased, and on behalf of TAMMY ARMSTRONG, individually, and as Guardian, Conservator, and Guardian-Ad-Litem for SRA, a minor, and SAA, a minor v. YOUTH ALTERNATIVE HOME ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:TAMMY ARMSTRONG, as the Personal Representative of SJR, deceased, and as Administratrix of the Estate of SJR, deceased, and on behalf of TAMMY ARMSTRONG, individually, and as Guardian, Conservator, and Guardian-Ad-Litem for SRA, a minor, and SAA, a minor, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. YOUTH ALTERNATIVE HOME ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTammy ArmstrongJeffrey Allen Tennyson
Heather Noble
AppelleeYouth Alternative Home Association, a Wyoming corporationCameron S. Walker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/26/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended index from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/14/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/01/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Youth Alternative Home Association and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/29/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lori Gorseth, GAL.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cameron Walker for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeffrey Tennyson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/11/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
08/12/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
08/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate Oral Argument. Called counsel for signed original, inadvertently left out.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate Oral Argument (Original)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/11/2009Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
09/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal