judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00100-CR
10-81-00100-CR
10/01/1981
Robbery
Tommy Edward Sanders
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/2006Letter sent to parties from court
11/27/2006Correspondence from interested entity
10/16/2006Order entered
09/05/2006Correspondence from interested entity
06/16/2006Case returned from higher court
06/16/2006Correspondence from interested entity
06/13/2006Case forwarded to higher court
06/13/2006Letter sent to parties from court
06/12/2006Correspondence from interested entity
06/07/2006Petition for Review filed in the Supreme Court
06/05/2006Correspondence from interested entity
05/30/2006Letter sent to parties from court
05/25/2006Correspondence from interested entity
05/18/2006Petition for discretionary review filed
05/01/2006Correspondence from interested entity
04/26/2006Opinion issuedDissenting Opinion
04/26/2006Order enteredDismissed
04/20/2006Letter sent to parties from court
03/28/2006Motion for Leave to File.
03/28/2006Motion for Leave to File.
03/28/2006Brief received, not filed
02/21/2006Correspondence from interested entity
02/02/2006Correspondence from interested entity
01/19/2006Letter sent to parties from court
01/05/2005Letter sent to parties from court
07/14/1982Case stored
07/14/1982Mandate issued by this Court
05/13/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppelleeCharles A. Rosenthal Jr.
Sanders, Tommy EdwardAppellantTommy Edward Sanders
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
303538
12 Years