judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00099-CR
10-81-00099-CR
10/01/1981
Theft Under $1500
Jorge Gaspar Gafas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/08/1982Case stored
09/08/1982Mandate issued by this Court
07/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/01/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 3
Harris
579083
30 Days + $100 Fine (probated)