judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00194-CR
08-81-00194-CR
10/01/1981
Rape
Kelley, Loren
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
02/28/1983Mandate Issued
02/22/1983No description available.
12/22/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
04/30/1982Brief Filed
03/30/1982Brief Filed
03/17/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
03/01/1982Record filed.
10/27/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Reeves
4207
Life