judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00103-CR
10-81-00103-CR
10/01/1981
Aggravated Assault
James Crofton, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/14/1983Case stored
02/14/1983Mandate issued by this Court
12/09/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/14/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
307016
Life