judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1264
B-1264
12/19/1968
Application for Writ of Error
SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO.
WALDO DUKE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/22/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/02/1969Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
01/23/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
12/30/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/19/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/22/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/07/1969Opinion issued
04/02/1969Brief in Support of Petition
01/23/1969Response to Petition
12/30/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/19/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/19/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sears, Roebuck and Co.Petitioner
Tom HensonAmicus Curiae
Waldo DukeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information