judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHESTER L. BIRD v. MICHAEL MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary

Case Heading (S-09-0035)
Case Number:S-09-0035Case Docketed On:02/25/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:CHESTER L. BIRD v. MICHAEL MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary
Full Title:CHESTER L. BIRD, Petitioner, v. MICHAEL MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerChester Loyde Bird Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/25/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/25/2009Petition - Writ - habeas corpus (Petition not served on Attorney General--copy sent)PetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
02/25/2009Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
03/13/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
03/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpus.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2009Order - Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusOrderDenyFinal
03/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/10/2009Event - Rejected Filing - received "Motion for Relief from Order", returned with letter to Mr. Bird.EventRejected FilingFinal