judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TIMOTHY BRANDONSCOTT LLOYD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1507
Short Caption:TIMOTHY BRANDONSCOTT LLOYD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Cruelty To Children
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-26935-09Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/03/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTimothy Brandonscott Lloyd Y
James W. KleinNY
Alec Karakatsanis YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (191 pgs/Maddox) 8/9/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (238 pgs/Jeon) 8/10/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (202 pgs/Maddox) 8/11/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (97 pgs/Jeon) 8/12/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (251 pgs/Rogers) 8/16-18/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (22 pgs/tape) 10/27/10 proc. w/cd
02/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (SEALED pleadings)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (unopposed)
04/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 5, 2011. (Castillo)
07/05/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before October 3, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (pii)
10/03/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/03/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
11/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 12/6/11.
12/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until December 20, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
12/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief on 12/20/11
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee unopposed motion for extension to file the brief on 1/18/12.
01/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
01/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 2/16/12.
02/03/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/03/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/12/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
06/12/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/20/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
06/20/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/21/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to suplement the record.
06/26/2012FiledArgued Before Judge Thompson,Oberly,Terry, Alec Karakatsanis Esq.,for appellant, L. Jackson Thomas II Esq.,for appellee.
07/12/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (government's exhibit)
01/24/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
01/24/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
02/04/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a petition rehearing or rehearing en banc to March 11, 2013.
03/18/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/19/2013FiledMandate