judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00098-CR
10-81-00098-CR
10/01/1981
Murder
Paul Luna Munoz
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/12/1982Case stored
04/12/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/02/1982Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
01/15/1982Petition for discretionary review filed
11/30/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1981Judgment Issued
11/12/1981Submitted
10/01/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/01/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/01/1981Docketing statement filed
10/01/1981Record filed
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/12/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
306784
Life