judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00097-CR
10-81-00097-CR
10/01/1981
Murder
David Emmet Drigger
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/18/1986Case stored
04/18/1986Mandate issued by this Court
09/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/16/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/18/2086Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
293669
30 Years