judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00019-CV
09-81-00019-CV
10/09/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Pace, W. Raymond, et al
Texas Real Estate Commission
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1983Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/18/1982Writ Filed
10/28/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/20/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/07/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
04/01/1982Submitted
01/07/1982Brief Filed
12/14/1981Brief Filed
10/27/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/16/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/09/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court
Orange
Honorable David A. Dunn
B 21,345