judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00317-CV
04-81-00317-CV
10/06/1981
Tax
Trevino, Hector, et al.
Starr County, Texas and Great Basins Petroleum Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1985Mandate Issued
10/11/1985Mandate Issued
10/10/1985Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/04/1985Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1985Brief Filed
08/30/1985Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
08/30/1985Motion for Leave Filed
08/22/1985Response to Motion Filed
08/20/1985Motion for Stay of Mandate DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1985Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
08/09/1985Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
08/09/1985Case Returned from Higher Court
08/08/1985Motion for Stay of Mandate Filed
07/17/1985Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
01/30/1985Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
11/01/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/23/1984Writ of Error filed
10/22/1984Writ of Error filed
09/20/1984Motion to Reinstate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/20/1984Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/20/1984No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
09/14/1984Affidavit for Motion Filed
09/06/1984Response to Motion Filed
08/31/1984Response to Motion Filed
08/20/1984No Description Available.
08/20/1984No Description Available.
08/20/1984Motion to Reinstate Filed
08/20/1984Response to Motion Filed
04/26/1984Motion for Leave Filed
12/22/1983Order Entered
12/22/1983Motion to Vacate DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1983Motion to Vacate Filed
12/13/1983Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/08/1983Motion for Leave Filed
12/07/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/06/1983Motion to hold in abeyance disposed.Motion or Writ Denied
12/06/1983Motion f/l/file Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/01/1983Motion f/l/file Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/23/1983Motion to hold in abeyance filed.
11/23/1983Motion f/l/file Rehearing Filed
11/10/1983Motion f/l/file Rehearing Filed
11/09/1983Motion to hold in abeyance disposed.Motion or Writ Granted
11/07/1983Motion to hold in abeyance filed.
10/20/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/20/1983No Description Available.
10/05/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1983Opinion issuedReversed
10/05/1983Opinion issuedReversed
10/05/1983Opinion issuedReversed
10/05/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1983Motion for Rehearing Granted
10/05/1983Opinion issuedReversed
10/05/1983Submission
10/05/1983Submitted
09/28/1983Response to Motion Filed
09/28/1983Response to Motion Filed
09/07/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/29/1983Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1983Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
08/15/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/11/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1983Motion to Advance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/1983Motion to Advance Filed
02/22/1983Submission
02/22/1983Submitted
11/28/1981No New Event but Update in Calendar
11/13/1981Brief Filed
11/13/1981Case ready to be set
10/26/1981Brief Filed
10/22/1981Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
10/06/1981No Description Available.
10/06/1981No Description Available.
10/06/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/25/1981Appeal Bond Filed
09/03/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Starr
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
3,059