judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00713-CV
01-81-00713-CV
10/07/1981
Miscellaneous/other civil
Fillion, Henry T.
Diane Thompson Troy Harris
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/25/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/25/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/17/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
10/05/1983Petition for writ of error from trial courtRefused
07/20/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
06/23/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/24/1983Motion for rehearing filed
02/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/20/1983Supplemental brief filed
01/18/1983Supplemental brief filed
01/12/1983Submitted
01/12/1983Submission
01/12/1983Submitted
12/09/1982Submission
08/19/1982Brief filed
04/30/1982Brief filed
10/07/1981Transcript filed
10/07/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/25/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information