judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-81-00293-CR
02-81-00293-CR
10/09/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mustaface, Muharem
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/1983Order EnteredRefused
04/22/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
03/23/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/14/1983Response Filed
03/07/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/19/1983Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1983En Banc Review
01/19/1983Motion Filed
01/13/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Calvin Ashley
23174-R
99 years