judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00703-CR
01-81-00703-CR
10/05/1981
Other Felony
Diggles, Bobby Ray (316182)
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/13/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/13/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1983Submission
01/12/1983Submitted
06/12/1982Brief filed
06/12/1982Case ready to be set
05/24/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
05/14/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/22/1982Record filed
10/05/1981Notice of appeal filed
10/05/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/13/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information