judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAPP (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33494
Short Caption:KAPP (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800858HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/17/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00438
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33294, 33361, 33494. 99-00308
05/17/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: hand delivered 5/17/99. 99-03989
05/17/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12072
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13732
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2000. 00-13732