judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEO GENE BLOOMFIELD, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0033)
Case Number:S-09-0033Case Docketed On:02/18/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:LEO GENE BLOOMFIELD, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LEO GENE BLOOMFIELD, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeo Gene Bloomfield Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 97
Citation:234 P.3d 366

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/18/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/06/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/21/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/12/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/24/2010Event - Phone Call. Contacted clerk of district court and requested proposed jury instructions.EventPhone CallFinal
06/25/2010Record - Other - received proposed jury instructions and placed in folder as part of record.RecordOtherFinal
07/12/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/28/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/28/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/03/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/2/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal