judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOHAMMED B. TALUCKDER V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1496
Short Caption:MOHAMMED B. TALUCKDER V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PWVK148643-08Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/28/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMohammed Taluckder NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/03/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/03/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
12/13/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED as to the 9/30/09 ORDER AND for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER as to the 11/24/10 ORDER as a motion for reconsideration does not toll the time for noting an appeal... (BY: ETW)
12/13/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
12/22/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- to 12/13/10 order
01/06/2011 ORDERED that this PFR IS DISMISSED as it is both UNTIMELY as to the 9/30/09 order and NON-APPEALABLE as to the 11/24/10 denial of petitioner's motion for reconsideration... SEE HARDCOPY (BRTEFA) (rn)
01/06/2011DISMISSED
01/28/2011MANDATE ISSUED