judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00324-CR
04-81-00324-CR
10/08/1981
Burglary
McDonald, Christopher R.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/07/1984Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/19/1983Submission
04/19/1983Submission
04/19/1983Submitted
10/28/1981Case ready to be set
10/28/1981Brief Filed
10/28/1981Case ready to be set
10/16/1981Brief Filed
10/08/1981Record Filed
09/24/1981Record Approved
04/21/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
04/21/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
80-CR-3359
20 Years