judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00162-CR
08-81-00162-CR
10/07/1981
Robbery
Davila, Mario Solis
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
01/27/1983Mandate Issued
11/17/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
06/14/1982Brief Filed
05/26/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/14/1982Brief Filed
03/03/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/12/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1982Order entered
02/10/1982No description available.
10/09/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/27/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
35684-243
Life