judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00160-CR
08-81-00160-CR
10/07/1981
Other Felony
Villescas, Guillermo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
08/05/1982Mandate Issued
04/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/09/1982Submitted
03/31/1982Submission
10/07/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
34th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Jerry Woodard
31226-34
10 yrs.