judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00319-CR
04-81-00319-CR
10/07/1981
Burglary
Tousant, James V.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/09/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/09/1983Mandate Issued
06/09/1983Mandate Issued
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/24/1982Submission
11/24/1982Submission
11/24/1982Submitted
03/26/1982Case ready to be set
03/26/1982Brief Filed
03/26/1982Case ready to be set
03/01/1982Brief Filed
01/29/1982Record Filed
10/07/1981Notice of appeal received
10/07/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
81-CR-1185
5 years