judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00326-CR
04-81-00326-CR
10/08/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Rodriguez, Mary Jane
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/15/1984Mandate Issued
03/15/1984Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
03/15/1984Mandate Issued
01/25/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/13/1983Submission
04/13/1983Submission
04/13/1983Submitted
10/08/1981Case ready to be set
10/08/1981Record Filed
10/08/1981Case ready to be set
10/08/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/29/1981Brief Filed
04/20/1981Brief Filed
04/20/1981Record Approved
12/13/1979Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/15/1984Case StoredCase stored
03/18/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ted Butler
78-CR-1527
25 Years