judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00330-CV
04-81-00330-CV
10/09/1981
Contract
Southern Steel Co.
Consolidated Engineering Co., Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/1985Mandate Issued
08/01/1985Mandate Issued
07/17/1985Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/1985Order Entered
01/23/1985Higher Court DecisionRefused
01/23/1985Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1985Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1985Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/19/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/17/1984Writ of Error filed
09/17/1984Writ of Error filed
08/16/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/16/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/16/1984Brief Filed
07/16/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/16/1984Brief Filed
07/16/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/29/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/29/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/26/1983Submission
01/26/1983Submission
01/26/1983Submitted
01/19/1983Brief Filed
12/16/1982Case ready to be set
12/16/1982Case ready to be set
07/13/1982Requests Oral Argument
07/12/1982Requests Oral Argument
06/29/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/21/1982Response to Motion Filed
06/17/1982Response to Motion Filed
06/09/1982Brief Filed
06/08/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/01/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief FiledMotion Granted in Part
06/01/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief FiledMotion Granted in Part
05/17/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/30/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/22/1982Brief Filed
02/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/29/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/1982Mot. EOT to file Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/18/1982No Description Available.
01/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Bond Filed
01/18/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/07/1982No Description Available.
10/21/1981Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedFiling is Moot
10/20/1981Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
10/16/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/13/1981No Description Available.
10/09/1981No Description Available.
10/09/1981No Description Available.
10/09/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1981Appeal Bond Filed
07/02/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Eugene Williams
79-CI-13177