judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUKE OSEI-KWAME V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-1495
Short Caption:LUKE OSEI-KWAME V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02261-10Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLuke Osei-KwameNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc) (No fee or IFP attached).
12/15/2010 ORDERED that petitioner, shall within 15 days from the date of this order, either tender the $100 filing fee or file a fully completed motion and financial information statement (attached) to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24(b). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
12/28/2010FiledPETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS GRANTED
01/12/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
01/12/2011FiledOrder Granting In Forma Pauperis
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript.
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/18/2011FiledOrder - directing motion, brief & appendix
09/19/2011LodgedReceived documents Titled Appeal In Forma Pauperis? (Petitioner)
09/19/2011LodgedReceived Appellant's Brief & Appendix (late) (Petitioner)
09/20/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
09/20/2011FiledDismissed
11/04/2011FiledMandate