judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROJAS (CUAUHTEMOC) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33493
Short Caption:ROJAS (CUAUHTEMOC) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7234Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00434
01/05/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Rough draft transcript due: January 11, 1999. 99-00028
01/15/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: January 22, 1999. 99-00280
01/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00441
01/22/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 11/16/98; 11/17/98; 09/01/98; and 09/02/98 proceedings. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. 99-00456
01/28/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 11/04/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Zoie Williams. 99-00618
02/10/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: on or before February 18, 1999. 99-00929
02/18/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Response. 99-01115
02/26/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Court reporter Lisa Manley shall submit the rough draft transcripts to the district court, the parties and this court within 10 days of this order, if she has not already done so. The fast track response shall be filed within 15 days of respondent's receipt of the transcripts. 99-01347
03/10/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 08/26/98; 09/01/99; and 09/02/99Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 99-01690
03/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01792
06/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-05336
07/19/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-06410
07/19/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 21, 1999. 99-06410