judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

UPTOWN CAFE, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a Uptown Cafe v. TOWN OF GREYBULL

Case Heading (S-09-0032)
Case Number:S-09-0032Case Docketed On:02/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:UPTOWN CAFE, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a Uptown Cafe v. TOWN OF GREYBULL
Full Title:UPTOWN CAFE, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a Uptown Cafe, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TOWN OF GREYBULL, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantUptown Cafe, Inc.G. Mark Garrison
AppelleeTown of GreybullLarry B. Jones
William L. Simpson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2010 WY 58
Citation:231 P3d 257

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/13/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/27/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, untimely (one day late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of brief on diskEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2009Notice-Incoming - No designation of record. Received notice from clerk of district court that no designation has yet been filed by counsel for appellant. No action at this time.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/26/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - G. Mark Garrison for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry B. Jones for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (G. Mark Garrison for appellant; Larry B. Jones for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Dismissing, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/14/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
05/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 9.07EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/01/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/27/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal