judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00150-CR
10-81-00150-CR
10/08/1981
Indecency with a Child
Richard E. Allsop
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/03/1982Case stored
05/03/1982Mandate issued by this Court
01/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/07/1982Submitted
10/08/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
52nd District Court
Coryell
9567
4 Years