judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-02209-CV
13-81-02209-CV
10/08/1981
Miscellaneous civil
First National Bank of Mercedes, Texas
La Sara Grain Company, et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/1984Mandate Issued
10/04/1984Mandate Issued
08/31/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/17/1984Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/30/1984Miscellaneous Motion
07/20/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/23/1984Higher Court DecisionReversed and Remanded
06/15/1983Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
12/16/1982Application for writ of error
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
139th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Fidencio M. Guerra
C1251-79-C