judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01750-CR
05-96-01750-CR
11/07/1996
Other Felony
FICK, WAYNE JEFFREY
TEXAS, THE STATE OF
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/28/1997MattConv
05/20/1997Mandate Issued
05/20/1997Order EnteredWithdrawn
05/20/1997Mandate Issued
05/20/1997Order EnteredWithdrawn
05/18/1997Supplemental Record Due
05/16/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal
04/18/1997Order EnteredAbated
02/28/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/28/1997Motion for Leave to File
02/24/1997Letter Filed
02/18/1997MattConv
11/23/1996Record due
11/14/1996Transcript Filed
11/08/1996Notice Sent
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
07/26/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/20/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Fick, Wayne JeffreyCriminal - AppellantJohn L. Teter
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Henry M. Wade
MA95-22182-A
365 DYS/12 MTHS PROB/500 F