judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01749-CV
05-96-01749-CV
11/07/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Leon's Fine Foods, Inc.
Garland Independent School District
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
01/06/2017Letter issued by the court
01/22/2004Return to storage
08/25/2003Record Returned
08/21/2003Pulled from storage
06/03/1999Record RetentionDestroy
09/28/1998Mandate Issued
09/28/1998Mandate Issued
03/05/1998petition for review disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/30/1997Petition for Review Filed
10/27/1997Mot to Ext Time File RehearingMotion or Writ Denied
10/27/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/06/1997Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/29/1997Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
09/29/1997Motion for Rehearing Tendered
08/26/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
08/26/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
08/22/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/18/199750.00 Filing Fee Due
05/27/1997Notice to appellant that brief is late
02/10/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/10/1997Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/06/1997Motion to Abate Filed
01/09/1997Motion to Reconsider DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1997Order EnteredVacated
01/06/1997Letter Filed
12/23/1996Motion to Reconsider
12/22/1996MattConv
12/16/1996ADR Referral Order IssuedReferred to Mediation
11/27/1996Motion - Ext to File Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1996Record due
11/22/1996Transcript Filed
11/18/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellee
11/18/1996Response to Motion
11/17/1996Response due
11/14/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
11/07/1996Motion - Ext. to File Bond
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/23/1996Appeal Bond Due
08/09/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/25/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Leon`s Fine Foods, Inc.AppellantSteven E. Rogers
Garland Independent School DisAppelleeGeorge Colby Scherer
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill L Hartman
95-40688-TK