judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1083
96-1083
11/07/1996
App Writ of Error
TARRANT COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT and APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF TARRANT COUNTY
COMDISCO INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/03/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondenton behalf of Comdisco, Inc.
02/20/1997Motion for RehearingPetitioneron behalf of Tarrant County Appraisal Districe & Appraisal Review Board
12/03/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/07/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerIncorrectly titled "Response to Application For Writ of Error"
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/08/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
04/03/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledrehearing overruled
03/03/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedon behalf of Comdisco, Inc.
02/20/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
02/20/1997Motion for Rehearingon behalf of Tarrant County Appraisal Districe & Appraisal Review Board
02/20/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord remains in the Clerk's Office
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedRefused
01/27/1997Petitioner's reply brief
12/03/1996Reply to Response
11/26/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/20/1996MET to file reply disposed ofForm Letter sent in response to motion for extension of timeForm Letter sent
11/07/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledIncorrectly titled "Response to Application For Writ of Error"
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/08/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F1 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COMDISCO, INC.RespondentMr. James B. Harris
APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF TARRPetitionerMr. Joseph T. Longoria
TARRANT COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRPetitionerMr. Robert A. Mott
Mr. Joseph T. Longoria
Court of Appeals Information:
02-95-00254-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd/Rem'd
927 SW2d 325, 08-08-96
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable TERRIE LIVINGSTON
Trial Court Information
348th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Michael D. Schattman
348-147686-93