judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01751-CR
05-96-01751-CR
11/07/1996
Other Felony
FICK, WAYNE JEFF
TEXAS, THE STATE OF
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1997Supplemental Record Due
06/23/1997Mandate Issued
06/23/1997Mandate Issued
05/30/1997Order EnteredWithdrawn
05/30/1997Order EnteredWithdrawn
05/28/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal
05/21/1997Order EnteredAbated
02/03/1997Letter Filed
01/28/1997MattConv
11/14/1996Transcript Tendered
11/08/1996Notice Sent
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/24/1996Record due
07/26/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fick, Wayne JeffCriminal - AppellantJohn L. Teter
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Henry M. Wade
MA95-33006-A
365 DYS/500 FINE/12 MTH PR