judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEE ALLEN YINGLING v. BARBARA ALICE YINGLING

Case Heading (S-09-0025)
Case Number:S-09-0025Case Docketed On:02/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:LEE ALLEN YINGLING v. BARBARA ALICE YINGLING
Full Title:LEE ALLEN YINGLING, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BARBARA ALICE YINGLING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLee Allen Yingling Pro Se
AppelleeBarbara Alice Yingling Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/20/2009Event - Phone Call. Received call from appellant indicating that he could not get brief filed by 3/23/09 and will request extension to file brief.EventPhone CallFinal
03/20/2009Event - Phone Call - Received second call from Appellant re inability to file brief, requested permission to fax file. Advised need original and six copies of brief and that they have to be filed in this Court by 5:00 on due date. Suggested contacting overnight courier.EventPhone CallFinal
03/23/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief (Fax filed)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/24/2009Order - Grant - extension of time (Advised Appellant that all pleadings must be served on Appellee)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/30/2009Brief - Appellant. Provided insufficient number of copies to the Court. Clerk advised him that he has to send to additional copiesBriefAppellantFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Additional copies briefNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/03/2009Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/21/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal