judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DC DEP'T OF HEALTH CARE FINANCE V. YVONNE SETTLES

Case Information: 10-AA-1492
Short Caption:DC DEP'T OF HEALTH CARE FINANCE V. YVONNE SETTLESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Lead: 10-AA-1475 Consolidated:10-AA-1492, 11-AA-0633
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHCF00070-10Filed Date:12/02/2010

Opening Event Date:12/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/22/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDistrict of Columbia Dep't of Health Care FinanceN
Richard S. LoveYY
Todd S. KimNY
RespondentYvonne Settles N
John C. KeeneyYN
Clayton G. NorthouseNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/02/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (No fee due filed by DC Gov't Agency).
12/02/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
12/28/2010 Upon consideration of the petitions for review in this matters, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that petitions for review nos. 10-AA-1475 and 10-AA-1492 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is F/O that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record wi hin 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record s ould include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App R. 16(A)(4). (JAC)
03/23/2011APPEARANCE - of Attorney, Jack Keeney who will represent the respondent (Yvonne Settles) on appeal.
06/13/2011 Upon consideration of the petitionf or review filed in 11-AA-633, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that petition for review nos. 11-AA-633 is consolidated with previously consolidated petitions for review nos. 10-AA-1475 and 10-AA-1492 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
06/13/2011 ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
09/09/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/10/28/10 hearing
09/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
11/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 11/14/2011, (Respondent) 11/23/2011, & (Intervenor) 12/23/2011
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
11/22/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal (Petitioner D.C. Dep't of Health Care Finance)**************FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 1/23/11 ORDERDenied
11/22/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Respondent -- Settles)Referred
11/23/2011FiledTMC//PETITIONS FOR REVIEW//DC CHARTERED'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF//LODGED BRIEF//RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS//PETITIONERS' MOTIONS TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND//LODGED OPPOSITIONS//REPLY//DC HEALTH CARE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL//OPPO//PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY//LODGED REPLY
11/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a Response to Motion to Dismiss (Petitioner D.C. Dep't of Health Care Finance)Granted
12/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Response to Ms. Settles Motion to Dismiss. Opposition/Reply/Answer (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan)Granted
12/14/2011FiledReply - to petitioners opposition to motion to dismiss (Respondent) **********************REFERRED
12/15/2011FiledMotion - to extend time until December 21, 2011 to reply to respondent's opposition to its motion for summary reversal (Petitioner D.C. Dep't of Health Care Finance)Granted
01/23/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO EXTEND TIME AND THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED LODGED BRIEF, OPPOSITIONS AND REPLY and...
01/23/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte THAT RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS REFERRED TO THE MERITS DIVISION ONCE ASSIGNED and DENYING THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL BUT GRANTING THE REQUEST TO FILE THE MOTION AS THE BRIEF and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE MOTION FOR REVERSAL AS THE BRIEF and RESPONDENT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/N 30 DAYS and PETITIONERS' REPLY BRIEFS SHALL BE FILED W/N 21 DAYS THEREAFTER
01/23/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner DC CHARTERED HEALTH PLAN)
01/23/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner DC CHARTERED HEALTH PLAN)
01/23/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner D.C. Dep't of Health Care Finance) ***MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 1/23/12 ORDER
01/23/2012FiledOpposition - to petitioner's motion for summary reversal (Respondent)
01/23/2012FiledReply to oppo to motion for summary reversal. (Petitioner D.C. Dep't of Health Care Finance)
01/23/2012FiledOpposition to resp motion to dismiss (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan) ***********REFERRED
01/23/2012FiledAnswer/Response to Yvone's motion to dismiss (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan) ****REFERRED
02/22/2012FiledBrief (Settles) (Respondent)
02/22/2012FiledMiscellaneous certification of practice pro bono publico (Respondent)
02/22/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/09/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte - entering appearance of Clayton G. Northouse, Esq., pro hac vice
03/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan & D.C. Department of Health Care Finance)Granted
03/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan)Granted
03/26/2012LodgedReply Brief (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan)
03/27/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief (Petitioner D.C. Chartered Health Plan)Granted
04/03/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan & D.C. Department of Health Care Finance), Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan), Motion For Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief (Petitioner D.C. Chartered Health Plan)
04/03/2012FiledReply Brief (Petitioner D.C. Dep't of Health Care Finance)
04/03/2012FiledCorrected Reply Brief (Petitioner District of Columbia Chartered Health Plan)
05/04/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Respondent)
07/23/2012FiledLetter From petitioner's attorney re: Daly D.E. Temchine will argue case (Petitioner D.C. Chartered Health Plan)
07/24/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Petitioner D.C. Chartered Health Plan)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/23/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Fisher,Oberly,McLeese. Daly D. Temchine Esq., for Petitioner D.C. Charterd Health Plan, Richard S. Love Esq.,for Petitioner D.C. Dept. of Health Care Finance, Jonh C. Keeney Esq.,for Respondent Yvonne Settles.
04/02/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Fisher, Oberly, and McLeese, Associate Judges.)
04/26/2013FiledMandate