judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01723-CV
05-96-01723-CV
11/06/1996
Mandamus
Kay L. Baker
The Honorable Curt Henderson
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
12/01/2016Letter issued by the court
12/01/2016Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/15/1998Writ FiledMotion or Writ Denied
09/04/1998Letter Filed
07/16/1998Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
07/16/1998Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
01/09/1998Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/08/199810.00 Fee Paid
01/07/1998Motion for Leave to File
10/30/199710.00 Fee Paid
10/30/1997Response to Motion
10/06/1997Supplemental Petition Filed
06/10/1997Supplemental Petition Filed
06/02/1997Response to Motion
05/21/1997Response to Motion
04/25/1997Motion for Leave to File Mandamus
12/06/1996Response to Motion
11/25/1996Exhibits Filed
11/25/1996Response to Motion
11/15/1996Response due
11/15/1996Response to Motion
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/05/1996Motion for Leave to File
11/05/1996Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Honorable Curt HendersonAppelleeRaymond E. Ladriere, Ii
Kay L. BakerAppellantChrista Brown
Pat Maloney
Honorable Curt HendersonJudge - Trial CourtCollin District Judge, 219th District Court
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court
Collin
219-816-96